Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:35:07 (UTC).

EEK LLC et al vs Nicholas Hemingway

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 EEK LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Nicholas Hemingway. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Overton, Carol. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1965

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EEK LLC

EEK INC.

Defendant

Hemingway, Nicholas A.

Not Classified By Court

All Unnamed Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rothbard, Todd B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: EEK LLC; EEK INC.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 524 North 2nd Street, Apartment #07, San Jose CA 95112; Awarded Against: Hemingway, Nicholas A.; Party: Names: EEK LLC; Hemingway, Nicholas A.; EEK INC.; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: issued 8/08/18, satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 524 North 2nd Street, Apartment #07, San Jose, CA 95112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: 524 North 2nd Street, Apartment #07, San Jose, CA 95112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Dismissal - Comment: against Does I through V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less