Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 08:25:34 (UTC).

Edelmira Vasquez et al vs Sears Operations LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 Edelmira Vasquez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sears Operations LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Kenneth and Sandhu, Theresia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5862

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Kenneth

Sandhu, Theresia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vasquez, Edelmira

Menendez, Kathya

Vasquez, Juan

Defendants

Sears Auto Center

Sears Operations LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Allen, Kenneth; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sears Operations LLC; Awarded Against: Vasquez, Edelmira; Vasquez, Juan; Comment: Plt. takes nothing. Insufficient evidence shown.; Party: Names: Vasquez, Edelmira; Vasquez, Juan; Sears Operations LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Allen, Kenneth; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount) - Comment: 2nd amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: Amended 1 Plt. and AOS for Sears.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Sandhu, Theresia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEARS AUTO CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where SEARS OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant