This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 19:19:08 (UTC).

E. Peri, et al vs M. Carruth

Case Summary

On 09/09/2013 E Peri filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Carruth. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9718

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward Peri

Los Altos, CA 94022

Peri, Edward

Defendants

Pet'S Delight

Los Altos, CA 94022

Megan Carruth

Mountain View, CA 94040

Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc

9125 Pehco Road

San Diego, CA 92121

Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.

9125 Rehco Road

San Diego, CA 92121

Carruth, Megan

Boulankina, Tatiana

Csc Lawyers Incorp Service

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Csc Lawyers Incorp Service; Party: Name: Boulankina, Tatiana; Party: Name: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.; Party: Name: Carruth, Megan; Party: Name: Pet's Delight; Party: Name: .; Party: Name: Peri, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Carruth, Megan; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Pet's Delight; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Peri, Edward; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.; Awarded Against: Peri, Edward; Comment: printdate=Jan 14 2014; freetext=defendants do not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jan 13 2014; judgstatusdate=Jan 14 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Carruth, Megan; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Pet's Delight; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Peri, Edward; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Petco Animal Supplies Stores, Inc.; Awarded Against: Peri, Edward; Comment: freetext=defendants do not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jan 13 2014; judgstatusdate=Jan 14 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Pet's Delight; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: .; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Peri, Edward; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $7501-$10000 Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less