This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 20:51:36 (UTC).

E. Park vs S. Issac, et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 E Park filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against S Issac. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Edwards, Thomas C, Madden, James P and Kelly, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5968

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Edwards, Thomas C

Madden, James P

Kelly, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Park

San Jose, CA 95118

Korean Newsweek

Park, Eric

Defendants

Sargiz Issac

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Shawn Del Grande

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Sunnyvale Hyundai

Sunnyvale Del Grand Inc.

Issac, Sargiz

Del Grande, Shawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Del Grande, Shawn; Party: Name: Issac, Sargiz; Party: Name: Park, Eric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Issac, Sargiz; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Park, Eric; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Park, Eric; Judgment Amount: $895.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Issac, Sargiz; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $145.00; Other: $750.00; Total: $895.00; Comment: printdate=Apr 20 2009; origjudgdate=Apr 20 2009; judgstatusdate=Apr 20 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Del Grande, Shawn; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Issac, Sargiz; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Park, Eric; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 06/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Edwards, Thomas C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = TCE - Edwards, Thomas Result Date = 05/29/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Edwards, Thomas C; Comment: Text = plt/respondent has sued the wrong party defs. plt/respondent's claim is dismissed as to sargiz issac and sargiz issac dba sunnyvale hyundai and sargiz issac dba sunnyvale, imports, inc. for misjoinder of parties. def/appellant is awarded costs. mr. park's right to refile a claim against the corporation that enterd into the contract is preserved subject to statue of limitations. Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = G Closed = 06/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Kelly, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JK3 - Kelly, John Result Date = 04/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; set in error; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 03/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amended Claim (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 03/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 02/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 04/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.