Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 10:52:53 (UTC).

E. Otovo, et al vs N. Masters, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2008 E Otovo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against N Masters. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Ellis, Terry, Triplett, John R, Madden, James P, Berry, Frank, Jr., Levinger, Mary Jo, MacDonald, David and Cain, Thomas WM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5771

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Ellis, Terry

Triplett, John R

Madden, James P

Berry, Frank, Jr.

Levinger, Mary Jo

MacDonald, David

Cain, Thomas WM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Erumena O Otovo, Sr.

Santa Clara, CA 95054

Jenefer B Otovo

Santa Clara, CA 95054

Otovo Builders

Otovo, Erumena O, Sr.

Otovo, Jenefer B

Defendants

Nick Masters

James Peterson

Los Altos, CA 94024

Ling Hullen

San Jose, CA 95129

Amalia Masters

Masters, Nick

Peterson, James

Hullen, Ling

Masters, Amalia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Peter A. Furst

1630 Union Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

Furst, Peter A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Hullen, Ling; Party: Name: Peterson, James; Party: Name: Masters, Nick; Party: Name: Otovo, Jenefer B; Party: Name: Otovo, Erumena O, Sr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Masters, Nick; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Otovo, Jenefer B; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Otovo, Erumena O, Sr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Otovo, Jenefer B; Judgment Amount: $6,009.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Masters, Nick; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $80.00; Other: $5,929.50; Total: $6009.50; Comment: printdate=Jun 16 2009; freetext=plt erumnea o. otovo, sr.dba: otovo builders & jenefer b. otovo dba: otovo builders to recover from def nick masters $5,929.50 plus $80.00 in costs for a total judgment of $6,009.50 - signed by judge levinger; origjudgdate=Jun 12 2009; judgstatusdate=Jun 16 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: MacDonald, David; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Masters, Nick; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Otovo, Jenefer B; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Otovo, Erumena O, Sr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Otovo, Jenefer B; Judgment Amount: $4,008.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Masters, Nick; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $80.00; Other: $3,928.00; Total: $4008.00; Comment: printdate=Mar 6 2009; origjudgdate=Feb 19 2009; judgstatusdate=Mar 6 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Hullen, Ling; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Peterson, James; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Masters, Nick; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Otovo, Jenefer B; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Otovo, Erumena O, Sr.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case; Judicial Officer: Ellis, Terry; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = TE - Ellis, Terry Result Date = 02/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination Appealed Case; Judicial Officer: Triplett, John R; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JRT - Triplett, John Result Date = 02/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2010
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = motion re. modification of judgment, per comm james madden Result By = C Result Judge = FB - Berry, Frank Result Date = 01/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC-Ntc to Appear in Court Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC-Ntc to Appear in Court Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: MacDonald, David; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = DM - McDonald, David Result Date = 02/19/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 01/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 11/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 02/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Arthur Furst