This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/06/2022 at 20:46:15 (UTC).

E. Hildebrand vs Santa Clara City Housing Authority LP, et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 E Hildebrand filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Santa Clara City Housing Authority LP. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Elfving, William J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8078

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Elfving, William J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emma Mae Hildebrand

Hildebrand, Emma Mae

Defendants

Santa Clara City Housing Authority Lp

Fpi Management Corp.

Kone Corp.

Roem Corp.

Caraballo, Leigh Ann

Jugant, Alex

Camino Del Rey Senior Apartments

Roem Development Corp.

Roem Builders Inc.

Roem, Inc.

Housing Authority of the City of Santa Clara

City of Santa Clara, CA

FPI Management, Inc.

2525 El Camino Senior Apartments, LP

Roem-Icon Contracting Group, Inc.

Kone, Inc.

Roem-Icon

Leigh Ann Caraballo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Other; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,; Comment: Taken on ntc of undocumented action. $925.00 paid for fees previously waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,; Comment: Request for Time to Have funds clear the Bank without Pennalties (Emma Hildebrand, In Pro Per) DENIED by Judge Zayner (see file for details)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Alex Jugant,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem-Icon Contracting Group, Inc.,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, City of Santa Clara, CA,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Housing Authority of the City of Santa Clara,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,; Comment: AMENDED Person Served: Robert Amami of El Camino Senio aprt LP DBA Camino Del Rey Senior Apts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem, Inc.,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem Builders Inc.,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem Builders Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Roem Development Corp.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Leigh Caraballo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 11/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Santa Clara City Housing Authority LP, FPI Management Corp., Kone Corp., Roem Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Santa Clara City Housing Authority LP, FPI Management Corp., Kone Corp., Roem Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Emma Hildebrand, Santa Clara City Housing Authority LP, FPI Management Corp., Kone Corp., Roem Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Emma Hildebrand,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camino Del Rey Senior Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ROEM-ICON CONTRACTING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant