This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/18/2019 at 22:18:11 (UTC).

E. Chu vs Rengstorf Home Owners Association

Case Summary

On 07/29/2013 E Chu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rengstorf Home Owners Association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Poppe, Matthew and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9644

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Poppe, Matthew

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emey H. Chu

Mountain View, CA 94043

Chu, Emey H.

Defendants

Rengstorf Home Owners Association

530 Oak Grove Avenue, Suite 101

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Latu, Joan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Latu, Joan; Party: Name: Rengstorf Home Owners Association; Party: Name: Chu, Emey H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Rengstorf Home Owners Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Chu, Emey H.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Rengstorf Home Owners Association; Awarded Against: Chu, Emey H.; Comment: printdate=Oct 29 2013; freetext=Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Oct 7 2013; judgstatusdate=Oct 29 2013; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Rengstorf Home Owners Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Chu, Emey H.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = request denied Legacy Name = SC Ord:Req to Correct or Cancel Decision = M Closed = 11/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • Answer: Request for Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Answer:Request for Court Order Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 10/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 09/11/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Poppe, Matthew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Text = Court grants defendant's request for continuance less than ten days prior to court date Result By = C Result Date = 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = ok to continue matter to 9/23/13 8:30am D86 Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $7501-$10000 Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less