This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 03:42:51 (UTC).

E. Buchanan vs Heating & Air Conditioning

Case Summary

On 10/06/2014 E Buchanan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Heating Air Conditioning. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7977

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emily P Buchanan

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Buchanan, Emily P

Defendant

Heating & Air Conditioning

934 Terminal Way

San Carlos, CA 94070

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Name: Heating & Air Conditioning; Party: Name: Buchanan, Emily P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Name: Heating & Air Conditioning; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Buchanan, Emily P; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Case Purged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Dismised; Comment: Text = Wrong defendant nameed, service not proper Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 11/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Cert. Mail Service. Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEATING AND AIR INC. is a litigant