This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:25:18 (UTC).

E. Ayala vs G. Monroy

Case Summary

On 06/21/2010 E Ayala filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against G Monroy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7241

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edwinds Ayala

Mountain View, CA 94043

Ayala, Edwinds

Defendants

Gerardo Monroy

Mountain View, CA 94041

Monroy, Gerardo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Monroy, Gerardo; Party: Name: Ayala, Edwinds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Monroy, Gerardo; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ayala, Edwinds; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ayala, Edwinds; Judgment Amount: $3,550.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Monroy, Gerardo; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $50.00; Other: $3,500.00; Total: $3550.00; Comment: printdate=Jul 28 2010; origjudgdate=Jul 26 2010; judgstatusdate=Jul 28 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Monroy, Gerardo; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ayala, Edwinds; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Debtor Sworn; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 06/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = OEX signed and service copy mailed back to creditor 4/10/15 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 04/06/2015 Log Note Text = {EvtCD=SC15; Jdg=695; Clk=698; HdrDtm=2015/04/06 1205pm; Notes=none; },

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = OEX signed and service copy mailed back to creditor 3/2/15 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 10/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated; set in error; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = fee waiver granted in whole by commissioner james madden. creditor notified by mail Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 11/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam Closed = 01/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/21/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less