This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:22 (UTC).

Dwight Johnson vs Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Dwight Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1806

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Dwight

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Capitol Ford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Santos, Rowena Guillermo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Restored to court's control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to complaint. Atty Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less