This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 21:32:20 (UTC).

D. Shiu v. K. Reed

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 D Shiu filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against K Reed. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Stoelker, James L and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3905

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Stoelker, James L

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shiu, Dungchin

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Reed, Kenneth

Coleman, Troy

Reed, Patricia

Unlimited Building & Plumbing Services

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-100

Not Classified By Court

Neutral Marc Bouret

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tse, Joseph

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Atterbury, Jeff Brandon

Parks, Scott G

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Bouret, Mark P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered (CV, PR); Party: Names: Shiu, Dungchin; Reed, Kenneth; Reed, Patricia; Coleman, Troy; ROES 1-100; Neutral Marc Bouret; Comment: Court Dismiss Case without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Request: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Atty Joseph Tse

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2016
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: atty: Parks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint Atty Parks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less