This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:32 (UTC).

Dragica Vrscaj et al vs Five Star Windows, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Dragica Vrscaj filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Five Star Windows, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bali, Vinita. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3556

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bali, Vinita

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vrscaj, Zdenko

Vrscaj, Dragica

Defendants

Five Star Windows

Halabi, Fadi Mohammed

Five Star Windows, Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bali, Vinita; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Vrscaj, Dragica; Vrscaj, Zdenko; Awarded Against: Five Star Windows, Inc.; Halabi, Fadi Mohammed; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $140.00; Total: $10140.00; Comment: Judgment is joint and serveral. See attached for further orders of court.; Party: Names: Vrscaj, Dragica; Vrscaj, Zdenko; Five Star Windows, Inc.; Halabi, Fadi Mohammed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Bali, Vinita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Bali, Vinita; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: POS on Amended Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: POS on Amended Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee) - Comment: Reset req'd by plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less