This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/21/2019 at 06:52:25 (UTC).

Dorothea Skaff vs Gregorio Cruz

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Dorothea Skaff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gregorio Cruz. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5940

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Skaff, Dorothea

Defendant

Cruz, Gregorio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stein, John C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Skaff, Dorothea; Cruz, Gregorio; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Stein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Stein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: *INVALID, SYSTEM FILED W/WRONG CASE #, printed/given to Liz - 1/14/19* otice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 1/15/19 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less