This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 06:37:23 (UTC).

Doroteo V. Vargas and Silvina A. Rangel

Case Summary

On 01/06/2014 Doroteo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Vargas and Silvina A Rangel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Johnson, Margaret S and Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1718

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Johnson, Margaret S

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doroteo Valencia Vargas

Petitioner

Vargas, Doroteo Valencia

Defendant

Silvina Alcazar Rangel

Respondent

Rangel, Silvina Alcazar

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Rangel, Silvina Alcazar; Party: Name: Vargas, Doroteo Valencia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Text = New Petn Filed-JN Result By = C Result Judge = JET - Towery, James Result Date = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Doroteo V. Vargas and Silvina A. Rangel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 04/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 04/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret S; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 01/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret S; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 01/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret S; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 01/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret S; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret S; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 01/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less