This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 21:16:35 (UTC).

Doris Sloniker vs Saumya Mohan

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Doris Sloniker filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Saumya Mohan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8814

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doris Sloniker

Defendant

Saumya Mohan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dawn Leigh Hassell

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

10/28/2021 Request: Dismissal

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/22/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/22/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Clerk Rejection Letter

10/21/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Doris Sloniker,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Doris Sloniker,; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice - Action dismissed 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Doris Sloniker,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Doris Sloniker,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Doris Sloniker,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASSELL, DAWN L.