This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/14/2021 at 13:43:27 (UTC).

Donald Sullivan vs Patricia Sullivan

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Donald Sullivan filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against Patricia Sullivan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0878

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Sullivan, Donald

Donald Sullivan

Respondents

Sullivan, Patricia

Patricia Sullivan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Benita A Ventresca

Respondent Attorney

David Alexander Yomtov

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: POS SANDO Purge Contempt, Reserve Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: purging contempt citation and reserving fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Contempt; Department: Department 77; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Contempt; Department: Department 77; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Contempt; Department: Department 77; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: POS Personal OSC & Affidavit for Contempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: OSC: Contempt; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: OSC & affidavit for contempt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 77; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 77; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Donald Sullivan,; Comment: (p)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Response: Legal Separation; Filed By: Patricia Sullivan,; Comment: Response: Legal Separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Donald Sullivan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Donald Sullivan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Legal Separation no minor; Filed By: Donald Sullivan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Donald Sullivan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Legal Separation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less