This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:45 (UTC).

Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc vs Marcelo Pina Flores

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marcelo Pina Flores. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borovoy, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3558

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Borovoy, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc

Defendant

Pina Flores, Marcelo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plt filed dismissal without prejduce in court.); Party: Names: Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc; Pina Flores, Marcelo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Con 't from 05/23/18 by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Comment: Plt filed dismissal in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Minute order of continuance was delivered to the parties. Filed on 05/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less