This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:48 (UTC).

Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc vs Jennie Cavazos Luna

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jennie Cavazos Luna. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borovoy, Roger and MacDonald, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3559

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borovoy, Roger

MacDonald, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc

Defendant

Cavazos Luna, Jennie M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plaintiff filed Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice); Party: Names: Don Roberto Jewelers, Inc; Cavazos Luna, Jennie M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Re- Set / Reserve from 09/12/18 by court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00. Matter order reset at 7/10/18 hearing. No POS as of 09/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: MacDonald, David; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00. Matter ordered reset at 5/23/18 hearing. / No POS as of 7/2/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00 - No POS as of 05/15/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less