This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:13:41 (UTC).

Distinctive Corporation vs Araceli Echeverria

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Distinctive Corporation filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Araceli Echeverria. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1807

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Appellants

Big Basin Burger Bar

Distinctive Corporation

Respondent

Echeverria, Araceli

Not Classified By Court

State Labor Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Carlson, Amy Richelle

Not Classified By Court and Respondent Attorney

Macias, Jimmy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Distinctive Corporation; Echeverria, Araceli; State Labor Commissioner; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered (CV, PR); Party: Names: Distinctive Corporation; Echeverria, Araceli; State Labor Commissioner; Comment: Stipulated Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to CCP 664.6, Signed by Judge Stoelker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Conditional.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal, Dismissal Hearing set for 11/29/18 @ 10:00am, D.9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Order - Comment: For Payment from Court Deposit $8,000.00 in favor of Araceli Echeverri, signed by Judge Arand.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Case ReOpened

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Order - Comment: **Signed** EFS 7/20/18rb Order Re: Disbursement of Undertaking and Dismissal *Pending*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service for Notice of Settlement, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Stipulation - Comment: Re: Disbursement of Undertaking and Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est 1 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Conditional date 9-1-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Timely filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Notice - Comment: of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice: Appeal (Labor Commissioner Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less