This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:20 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Vinh Vu

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vinh Vu. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1848

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Vu, Vinh Q

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Vu, Vinh Q; Amount; Damages: $2,545.11; Costs: $294.50; Total: $2839.61; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Vu, Vinh Q

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $2839.61 (e-serve 05/03/19 #2842526)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Non- Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Calculation Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Statement of Evidence in Support of Entry of Default Judgment CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less