This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:03 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Vinay Kudumula

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Vinay Kudumula. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1817

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Kudumula, Vinay Seetaram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Layman, Patrick J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Vinay Seetaram Kudumula

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less