This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 22:44:47 (UTC).

Discover Bank Vs R. Barnd Sr.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R Barnd Sr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2813

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendants

Raymond A. Barnd, Sr.

Barnd, Raymond A., Sr.

Raymond A. Barnd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suttell & Hammer

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

Osterman, Peter R.

Peter Russell Osterman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Discover Bank, Raymond Barnd,; Comment: Text = by atty Patterson Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 02/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Non-Service; Filed By: Discover Bank, Raymond Barnd,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Discover Bank, Raymond Barnd,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Discover Bank, Raymond Barnd,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Discover Bank, Raymond Barnd,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Osterman, Peter R