This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:16 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Michael Anderson

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Anderson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1835

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Anderson, Michael D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: **PROPOSED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Statement - Comment: STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 8:46 AM; Result: Held; Comment: & OSC re: Def's FTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Pro Per **STRICKEN PER MINUTE ORDER 6/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less