This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:08 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Lorena Hernandez

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lorena Hernandez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1834

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Hernandez, Lorena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Judgment Amount: $2,070.40; Awarded Against: Hernandez, Lorena; Amount; Damages: $1,775.90; Costs: $294.50; Total: $2070.40; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Hernandez, Lorena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: interest $103.64; date of mailing 4/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: TOTAL: $2070.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Non- Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Calculation Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Re: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less