This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Jorge Casillas, Sr.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jorge Casillas, Sr. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5864

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendants

Casillas, Jorge

Casillas, Jorge, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cara, Grace Gail

Taneja, Amit

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Casillas, Jorge, Sr.; Amount; Damages: $3,191.21; Costs: $394.00; Total: $3585.21; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Casillas, Jorge, Sr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $3,585.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Underlying Action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Waiver: Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Does Only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Declaration of Non-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less