This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:54 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Hoa Nguyen

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hoa Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1857

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Nguyen, Hoa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Nguyen, Hoa; Amount; Damages: $7,999.65; Costs: $294.50; Total: $8294.15; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Nguyen, Hoa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $8,294.15 [MAILED 4/17/19]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Lost Originals.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Re: Non-Military Status.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less