This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/03/2022 at 16:52:09 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs E. Joseph

Case Summary

On 06/07/2010 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against E Joseph. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5064

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Eric L. Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mandie Jane Bullock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Attachment (Filed); Comment: Text = PARTIAL SATISFACTION - Los Angeles, issued 7/1/13, deficit $7,162.76 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Attach/Returned Satis Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = Interest: $3097.27 mailed 5/7/13 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = Los Angeles $14,599.50 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Discover Bank,; Comment: Text = memo/cost & writ - Document must be filed in the South County Courthouse at 301 Diana Avenue in Morgan Hill. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 05/30/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = costs $344 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = As to Does 1 to 10 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = Supplemental Declaration in support of interest Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 585; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = Total Judgment $11,477.23 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = costs $344.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Non-Service; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Discover Bank, Eric Joseph,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BULLOCK MANDIE