Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:36 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Brett Hartman

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brett Hartman. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2301

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Hartman, Brett J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Discover Bank; Hartman, Brett J; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: FTA/FTS - No special or telephonic appearances allowed. Plt s FTA may result in dismissal of the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: REQUESTEZB FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less