Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:36:23 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Alireza Khosravinejad

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alireza Khosravinejad. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2214

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Khosravinejad, Alireza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wong, Jennifer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Khosravinejad, Alireza; Amount; Damages: $1,505.47; Costs: $308.19; Total: $1813.66; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Khosravinejad, Alireza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $1813.66 (e-serve 05/31/19 #2953686)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Section 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Re Non-Active Military Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Statement - Comment: Statement of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less