Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:20:52 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Agapito Dionisio

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Agapito Dionisio. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7547

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Dionisio, Agapito

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tang, Jason W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Dionisio, Agapito; Amount; Damages: $7,859.46; Costs: $294.50; Total: $8153.96; Party: Names: Discover Bank; Dionisio, Agapito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Amount in #16 of the Writ of Execution does not match the amounton the Memorandum of Costs filed on 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: interest $903.78; date of mailing 3/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: by Clerk, $8,153.96 total. [eServed 112818, env# 2212572]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: Clerk's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less