This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 04:20:01 (UTC).

Diane Tarifa vs BMV Hotels LP

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Diane Tarifa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BMV Hotels LP. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8591

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Tarifa

Defendant

BMV Hotels LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Schaff

Defendant Attorney

P. Christian Scheley

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

3/29/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

3/29/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

9/21/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

9/21/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/1/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

6/1/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Demand

5/22/2019 Demand

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/22/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/22/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/27/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/15/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/13/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/19/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

9/3/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2021 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/10/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

9/21/2021 Minute Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: BMV Hotels LP,; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Diane Tarifa,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: BMV Hotels LP,; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: BMV Hotels LP,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Diane Tarifa,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BMV Hotels LP,; Comment: to Complaint. Atty O'Brien

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Diane Tarifa,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand; Filed By: Diane Tarifa,; Comment: re: Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Diane Tarifa,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Diane Tarifa,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Diane Tarifa,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less