This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:02 (UTC).

D.H. Smith Company, Inc. vs J.R. Roberts/Deacon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 D H Smith Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against J R Roberts/Deacon, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6072

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.H. Smith Company, Inc.

Defendants

Preg 100 Moffett

J.R. Roberts/Deacon, Inc.

Deacon Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hara, Terence James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: D.H. Smith Company, Inc.; J.R. Roberts/Deacon, Inc.; Deacon Corporation; Preg 100 Moffett; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty O'Hara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 7/17/18 3:45pm D6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Preg 100 Moffett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: JR Roberts/Deacon, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Deacon Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less