This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 04:12:00 (UTC).

Derrick Hix et al vs RealPage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Derrick Hix filed an Other lawsuit against RealPage, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Barrett, Thang N and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9905

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hix, Derrick

Defendants

On-Site Manager, Inc.

RealPage, Inc.

Orchard City Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Murphy, Patricia A

Defendant Attorneys

Barrick, Cara F.

Guzman, Anthony

Smith, Philip James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: C/F 2-09-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Order - Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder: Motion to be relieved as counsel - Comment: GRANTED effective upon the filing of the proof of service of this signed order upon the client - signed by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMotion: Withdraw as attorney - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Def Orchard City Holdings Inc. (Philip Smith)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketResponse/Reply - Comment: Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 8-11-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOpposition/Objections - Comment: Date TBD Opposition to Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Patricia Murphy

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support - Comment: Declaration of Patricia Murphy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Comment: substituting DOE 1: Orchard City Holdings, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: EN 4002844 - The document is filed in the incorrect correct. RE: application and order to serve secretary of state - requires a $60 application fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: answer to complaint atty Barrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RealPage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where On-Site Manager, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Murphy, Patricia A