This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 19:20:11 (UTC).

Daymay Sheng vs Leotek Electronics USA LLC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 Daymay Sheng filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Leotek Electronics USA LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2025

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheng, Daymay

Daymay Sheng

Defendant

Leotek Electronics USA LLC

Others

Wang, Mary

Mary Wang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Navarette, Arthur Albert

Hawes, Brian E

Arthur Albert Navarette

Brian E Hawes

Defendant Attorneys

Nagatani, Brian Koji

Wang, Mary

Brian Koji Nagatani

Mary Wang

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

5/15/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

5/15/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

5/15/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/13/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/13/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

2/13/2018 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

10/11/2017 Minute Order

Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

12/19/2017 Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

12/19/2017 Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/29/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Opposition/Objections

1/30/2018 Opposition/Objections

Proof of Service

2/5/2018 Proof of Service

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

2/5/2018 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/9/2018 Statement: Case Management Conference

Order: Submitted Matter

2/14/2018 Order: Submitted Matter

Minute Order

2/16/2018 Minute Order

Minute Order

2/16/2018 Minute Order

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

2/28/2018 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Leotek Electronics USA LLC,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Leotek Electronics USA LLC,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Daymay Sheng,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Leotek Electronics USA LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Leotek Electronics USA LLC,; Comment: to First Amended Complaint; Atty Wang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application for Refund; Filed By: Daymay Sheng,; Comment: $150.00 Advance Jury fee deposit from 2/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Daymay Sheng,; Comment: Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Daymay Sheng,; Comment: $ 150 paid, atty: Navarette.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Daymay Sheng, Leotek Electronics USA LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Daymay Sheng,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Brian Nagatani, Leotek Electronics USA LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: Leotek Electronics USA LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEOTEK ELECTRONICS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Navarette, Arthur Albert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWES, BRIAN E.