This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:42 (UTC).

David Rand vs Property Security Services, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 David Rand filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Property Security Services, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schatzel, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3585

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schatzel, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rand, David

Defendants

Memon, Asma

Husain, Memon A

Husain, Memon Asma Mohd

Property Security Services, Inc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Rand, David; Property Security Services, Inc; Husain, Memon A; Memon, Asma; Husain, Memon Asma Mohd; Comment: Plt. dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fees paid $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less