This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:38 (UTC).

David Rand vs Michael Demetro et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 David Rand filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael Demetro. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schatzel, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3584

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schatzel, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rand, David

Defendants

Demetro, Anthony

Demetro, Joey

Demetro, Michael Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Rand, David; Awarded Against: Demetro, Michael Anthony; Demetro, Joey; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $220.00; Total: $2720.00; Comment: Judgment is joint and several as to defendants.; Party: Names: Rand, David; Demetro, Michael Anthony; Demetro, Joey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Order - Comment: ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT. Order. The request to correct a clerical error in the judgment is granted (change name Anthony Demetro to Michael Anthony Demetro). Pro Tem Judge Thomas Schatzel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Order To Produce Statement Of Assets And To Appear For Examination: Only one judgment debtor's name is permitted within the Order and Application parts of the document. You listed both judgment debtors' name. ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Order To Produce Statement Of Assets And To Appear For Examination: The defendant's/judgment debtor's name does not match the original information on file. ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Second Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment received 9/20/18: Document is not signed. Original SC-108 was filed and processed 6/25/18 now pending an order from Judge Pro Tem Thomas Schatzel. ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Name on SC-134 Order to produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination does not match name on Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: sent to Plt. only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Copy of Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Comment: Endorsed copy mailed to Plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Serve on: Baniqua Martin, Registered Agent. POS on: Subpoena.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Request - Comment: REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less