This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 11:44:06 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Burdick Painting

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Burdick Painting. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3833

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Villagran Hernandez

Defendant

Burdick Painting

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Mahoney

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Christophe Bellafronto

Karin Morgan Cogbill

Michael W. M. Manoukian

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed: Comment: Summons

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/19/20 at 10am in D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

Civil Lawsuit Notice

2/21/2020 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/21/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/21/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/3/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

3/6/2020 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Notice

3/24/2020 Notice

Notice

5/19/2020 Notice

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/4/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/12/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/19/2020 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/19/2020 Minute Order

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 1/5/22 at 2:30pm D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 9/15/21 at 2:30pm D3.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 5/12/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall (D3).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Burdick Painting,; Comment: re: of Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Burdick Painting,; Comment: Notice of Appearance and Complex fee only paid - FAF of $435.00 still due.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Burdick Painting,; Comment: Notice of appearance requires filing fee of $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: David Hernandez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/19/20 at 10am in D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: David Hernandez,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: David Hernandez,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: David Hernandez,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burdick Painting Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY, KEVIN