This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:11 (UTC).

David Godinez vs John Freeman, III

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 David Godinez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against John Freeman, III. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1869

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Godinez, David Louise

Defendant

Freeman, John Leonard, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scher, Gerald Herbert

Defendant Attorney

Mabrey-Aleem Duncan, Kymberly J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Comment: EST. 3-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: No Special or Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 10/30/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Motion: Compel Answers - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Plt David Louise Godninez' Verified Response to Form Interrogs, Special Interrogs, and Request for Production of Documents, Sets One, and for Sanctions by Def John Leonard Freeman III (Kymberly Aleem-Duncan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Duncan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint RE John Leonard Freeman III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less