This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 17:21:32 (UTC).

Darlene Burch and Sean Burch

Case Summary

On 04/11/2014 Darlene Burch and Sean Burch was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Parker, Kimberly, Zayner, Theodore C, Arand, Mary E, Pennypacker, Philip H, Huber, Joseph H. and Berra, Richard C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2166

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Parker, Kimberly

Zayner, Theodore C

Arand, Mary E

Pennypacker, Philip H

Huber, Joseph H.

Berra, Richard C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darlene Burch

Petitioners

Guerra, Darlene

Burch, Darlene

Defendant

Sean Burch

Respondent

Burch, Sean

Not Classified By Court

Pacific State Industries 401k Plan

Minors

Burch, Ian

Burch, Iris

Burch, Knox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter J. Boskovich

1666 The Alameda

San Jose, CA 95126-2264

Petitioner Attorney

Bechtel, Catherine Anne

Respondent Attorneys

Baugh, Bradford

Parrett, Natasha May

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Burch, Darlene; Burch, Sean; Burch, Ian; Burch, Knox; Burch, Iris; Pacific State Industries 401k Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Custody Settlement Conf - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: set by agreement per thao do's office-ve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: visitation and vacate 8/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FL-NTC OF CUSTODY SETTLEMENT CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • FL-NTC OF CUSTODY SETTLEMENT CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: w/pos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Family Court Services with Objections to Recommended Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: served Catherine Bechtel Objections to Recommended Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Opposition/Objections - Comment: Respondent's Objections to recommend Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: time estimate: 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2014
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Resp Decl to Request for Order Decision = M Closed = 06/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 06/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 06/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Request for Order: Custody/Child Support/Visitation - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (P) atty fees and costs, spousal support Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Custody/Visit/Support Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less