This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 05:12:26 (UTC).

Darlene Boyd vs Anthony Caruso et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 Darlene Boyd filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Anthony Caruso. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7283

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darlene Boyd

Defendants

Anthony Caruso

Jay E. Chandler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

G Scott Emblidge

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey B Hare

 

Court Documents

Withdrawal of...

4/4/2019 Withdrawal of...

Request: Dismissal

4/2/2019 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Lis Pendens

2/15/2019 Notice: Lis Pendens

Minute Order

2/11/2019 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Mail

1/28/2019 Proof of Service: Mail

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/18/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/18/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/26/2018 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/30/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/30/2018 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/30/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/30/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Withdrawal of...; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Lis Pendens; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Anthony Caruso, Jay Chandler,; Comment: Case Management Statement 2/5/19 345pm D2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,; Comment: HRG 2-5-19 Plaintiff Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Anthony Caruso, Jay Chandler,; Comment: To Complaint; Atty Hare

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Darlene Boyd,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (on Anthony Caruso)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Darlene Boyd,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (on Jay E. Chandler)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Darlene Boyd,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Darlene Boyd,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hare, Jeffrey B