This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 21:52:08 (UTC).

Daniel Johnson vs John Dariano et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2016 Daniel Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against John Dariano. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4021

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Daniel

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Grebin, Svitlana

Dariano, John

J A Netzel Construction

Netzel, James

J Dariano Painting

Grebin, Andrii

Dariano Painting

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Dariano, John

J A Netzel Construction

Netzel, James

J Dariano Painting

Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America

Dariano Painting

Endurance Assurance Corporation

Old Republic Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schaar, Daniel C

Schaar, Daniel C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wagner, Charles W.

Mitchell, Robert B

Keiley, Anthony J., III

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell, Robert B

Keiley, Anthony J., III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Dariano, John; Netzel, James; Grebin, Andrii; Grebin, Svitlana; Old Republic Surety Company; Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America; Dariano, John; Endurance Assurance Corporation; Comment: As to X-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 4-03-18 **Re: the cross-complaint only**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Cross-Complaint filed on 07/07/16 by Def James Netzel ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Complaint ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice - Comment: of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 06/26/18Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3rd cont

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less