This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 22:06:36 (UTC).

Precision Logistix, LLC VS R. Vosters

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 Precision Logistix, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R Vosters. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Zayner, Theodore C, Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2071

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Zayner, Theodore C

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Precision Logistix, LLC

Guido, Daniel

Paco, Fabian

Trustee of the Pestana 1986 Family Trust

Speedy Pallets

Pestana, Irene

Vosters, Lou

RJ Construction Services

Daniel Guido

Alan Nelson

Karen Nelson

Irene Pestana

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Nelson, Alan

SESA Group, Inc

Kiesling, William Karl

Vosters, Randy

Paco, Fabian

Trustee of the Pestana 1986 Family Trust

Speedy Pallets

Pestana, Irene

Nelson, Karen

William Karl Kiesling

Randy Vosters

Interested Party

Prozan, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Interested Party Attorney

Prozan, Michael W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hess, Randy M.

Arakawa, Gregory Patrick

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Arakawa, Gregory Patrick

Prozan, Michael W.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael William Prozan

Gregory Patrick Arakawa

 

Court Documents

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

1/31/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

1/31/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

1/31/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

1/31/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

1/31/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

Review: Case Status

10/25/2018 Review: Case Status

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/22/2018 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/22/2018 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/22/2018 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/22/2018 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Conference: Further Case Management

10/24/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

10/24/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

10/24/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

10/24/2017 Conference: Further Case Management

Review: Mediation Status

6/22/2017 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

6/22/2017 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

6/22/2017 Review: Mediation Status

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

9/22/2016 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order of dismissal signed by Judge Pierce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Daniel Guido, Precision Logistix, LLC,; Comment: The case number is missing on the notice of non attendance document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Michael Prozan,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Alan Nelson,; Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Irene Pestana,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Alan Nelson,; Comment: partial with prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed 7-1-16 as to Irene Pestana, Trustee of the Pestana 1986 Family Trust only

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Alan Nelson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order; Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Michael Prozan, Daniel Guido, Precision Logistix, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Michael Prozan, Daniel Guido, Precision Logistix, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Michael Prozan, Daniel Guido, Precision Logistix, LLC, Randy Vosters,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Prozan, Michael William

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARAKAWA, GREGORY P.