This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 00:04:19 (UTC).

Daniel Ebrahemi vs Edward Falk

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Daniel Ebrahemi filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Edward Falk. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5298

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Ebrahemi

Defendant

Edward Falk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Maurice Sullivan

Defendant Attorney

Nicolas Arthur Flegel

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/10/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

10/10/2022 Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

12/22/2022 Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Proof of Service: Mail

2/28/2023 Proof of Service: Mail

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/28/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

3/7/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Edward Falk,; Comment: HRG 03/14/23 Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Daniel Ebrahemi,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Daniel Ebrahemi,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Edward Falk,; Comment: to complaint: atty Flegel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Daniel Ebrahemi,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Daniel Ebrahemi,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Daniel Ebrahemi,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less