This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 11:08:02 (UTC).

Kearns, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Kearns filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Robinhood Financial LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5872

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kearns, Sydney

Kearns, Dorothy

Kearns, Dan

Defendants

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zussman, Marc Irwin

Brown, Ethan Joseph

Blakeman, J Benjamin

Defendant Attorneys

Wisoff, Carl Brandon

McLorg, Kyle A.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Entry of Order: Comment: Notice Of Order Deeming Case Complex And Staying Discovery And Responsive Pleading Deadline

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Order

Letter from U.S. District Court, Northern District of California, docket entries and remand order: Comment: Order remanding case to state court (from Federal Court).

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

Notice

Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/3/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil. R. Kulkarni for all purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Removed to Federal Court on 2/9/21. Remand Order issued 2/12/21. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 2/25/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Order - Notice: Entry of Order: Comment: Notice Of Order Deeming Case Complex And Staying Discovery And Responsive Pleading Deadline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Letter from U.S. District Court, Northern District of California, docket entries and remand order: Comment: Letter from U.S. District Court, Northern District of California, enclosing copies of docket entries and Remand Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/3/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil. R. Kulkarni for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant