This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:55 (UTC).

Dalal Ammar vs Ramzy Ammar

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Dalal Ammar filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ramzy Ammar. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3873

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ammar, Dalal

Respondent

Ammar, Ramzy

Minor

AMMAR, MARC A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: response to disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: by personal service re: petition, summons...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p)community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition Filed - Comment: w/ marital settlement agreement; fln

    Read MoreRead Less