This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 09:40:10 (UTC).

Daisy Juntado et al vs TLC of The Bay Area, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Daisy Juntado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TLC of The Bay Area, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Kirwan, Peter and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5881

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Kirwan, Peter

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juntado, Daisy

Finuliar, Anna Liza

Sebastian, Ayesa

Daisy Juntado

Ayesa Sebastian

Anna Liza Finuliar

Defendants

Daisy Partners, LP

TLC of The Bay Area, INC.

Davey, Merlin

Valley House

Radford, Rae Ann

Valley House Rehabilitation Center

Colkitt, Douglas

Colkitt, Marcy

dba VALLEY HOUSE REHABILITATION CENTER

Merlin Davey

Rae Ann Radford

Marcy Colkitt

Douglas Colkitt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sobati, Reza

Reza Sobati

Defendant Attorneys

Le Melle, Tiffany Anne

Walker, Kathleen Marie

Christopoulos, Lynnette Avaness

William Crawford Wilson

Kathleen Marie Walker

Lynnette Avaness Christopoulos

Tiffany Anne Le Melle

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

6/29/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/29/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

6/29/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Declaration

9/27/2019 Declaration

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/27/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/27/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

10/1/2019 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/24/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/25/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Clerk Rejection Letter

11/13/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Demurrer

11/20/2019 Demurrer

Minute Order

6/11/2021 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/14/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/14/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/29/2021 Minute Order

Minute Order

7/8/2021 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

11/17/2021 Request: Dismissal

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Daisy Juntado,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Motion hearings; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Rae Radford, dba VALLEY HOUSE REHABILITATION CENTER, TLC of The Bay Area, INC.,; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Rae Radford, dba VALLEY HOUSE REHABILITATION CENTER, TLC of The Bay Area, INC.,; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Motion hearings; Department: Department 20; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: TLC of The Bay Area, INC., Daisy Partners, LP, Merlin Davey,; Comment: Demurrer to Complaint, 02/11/2020, 9:00am, dept. 19, atty Le Melle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: TLC of The Bay Area, INC., Daisy Partners, LP, Merlin Davey,; Comment: En# 3646255 RE: Demurrer and Motion to Strike - First appearance fee of $435 is due for all three defendants at this time. Please resubmit with the correct fees attached, $1,305.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Daisy Juntado,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Daisy Juntado,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Daisy Juntado,; Comment: $150 jury fee deposited for plaintiff Daisy Juntado et al by atty Sobati

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Daisy Juntado, Ayesa Sebastian, Anna Finuliar,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Daisy Juntado, Ayesa Sebastian, Anna Finuliar,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Daisy Juntado, Ayesa Sebastian, Anna Finuliar,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Daisy Juntado, Ayesa Sebastian, Anna Finuliar,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TLC of the Bay Area, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Valley House Rehabilitation Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOBATI REZA