This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 08:02:18 (UTC).

D. Shields, et al vs L. Spitters

Case Summary

On 07/28/2006 D Shields filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against L Spitters. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobs-May, Jamie, Madden, James P and Levinger, Mary Jo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3664

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobs-May, Jamie

Madden, James P

Levinger, Mary Jo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David S Shields

Lynn M Smolik

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Shields, David S, MD

Smolik, Lynn M, MD

Defendants

Laurence L Spitters

Palo Alto, CA 94301

L. S. & Co.

Spitters, Laurence L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel L. Casas

2

Los Altos, CA 94022

Casas, Daniel L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Spitters, Laurence L; Party: Name: Smolik, Lynn M, MD; Party: Name: Shields, David S, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Spitters, Laurence L; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Smolik, Lynn M, MD; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Shields, David S, MD; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Smolik, Lynn M, MD; Judgment Amount: $4,444.72; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Spitters, Laurence L; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $95.00; Other: $4,349.72; Total: $4444.72; Comment: printdate=Sep 8 2006; origjudgdate=Sep 7 2006; judgstatusdate=Sep 8 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Spitters, Laurence L; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Smolik, Lynn M, MD; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Shields, David S, MD; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2008
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = Matter settled after conference. Terms recited into record. The parties stipulate that the underlying small claims judgment will be vacated and that this settlement will be judicially supervised. Each side to bear own costs & fees. Appeal Dismissed. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court. Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Jacobs-May, Jamie; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed: Appeal; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JJM - Jacobs-May, Jamie Result Date = 11/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Defendant's trial brief filed by attorney L. Spitters. Legacy Name = SC Other Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = old pro per new D Casas Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: vacated; reset future month; Comment: Text = Continued by Plt's Request to 11-8-06 Result By = C Result Judge = MJL - Levinger, Mary Jo Result Date = 10/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2006
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 09/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casas, Daniel L.