This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 23:08:03 (UTC).

D. S. vs DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 D S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8924

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D. S.

Defendants

DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation

DOE 2, a religious corporation sole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William E. Donahoo

 

Court Documents

Order

1/17/2023 Order

Notice

12/29/2022 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

12/27/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/19/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/19/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Application

12/19/2022 Application

Declaration

12/19/2022 Declaration

Declaration

12/19/2022 Declaration

Declaration

12/19/2022 Declaration

 

Docket Entries

05/30/2023

HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of Merit; Comment: Certificate of Facts

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of Merit; Comment: Certificate of Facts

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of Merit; Comment: Certificate of Facts

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Order Seal documents.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Notice of Lodging Certificates of Merit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Comment: envelope #10795445 Proposed Order - EFS-020 Coversheet required.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: *PENDING REJECTION*BRA Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Application; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Application for In Camera Review and Order to Seal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Certificate of Merit - Mental Health Practitioner (redacted)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Certificate of Merit - Attorney for Plaintiff D.S. re DOE 1 (redacted)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: D. S.,; Comment: Certificate of Merit - Attorney for Plaintiff D.S. re DOE 2 (redacted)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less