This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 11:15:23 (UTC).

D. Nicoli vs T. Webb

Case Summary

On 02/09/2010 D Nicoli filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against T Webb. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Triplett, John R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6886

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Triplett, John R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dominic E Nicoli

Los Altos, CA 94022

Nicoli, Dominic E

Defendants

Tracey E Webb

El Cerrito, CA 94530

Webb, Tracey E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Webb, Tracey E; Party: Name: Nicoli, Dominic E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Webb, Tracey E; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Nicoli, Dominic E; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Nicoli, Dominic E; Judgment Amount: $2,608.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Webb, Tracey E; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $108.00; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2608.00; Comment: printdate=Mar 30 2010; origjudgdate=Mar 29 2010; judgstatusdate=Mar 30 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Webb, Tracey E; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Nicoli, Dominic E; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Def came in with EJ-100 signed and notarized by plt saying paid in full. Copy of abstract filed at Contra costa county included as well. Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Triplett, John R; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Bench warrant order issued; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JRT - Triplett, John Result Date = 11/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam Closed = 09/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; set in error; Comment: Result By = C Result Date = 02/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 02/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less