This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:34:34 (UTC).

Cynthia Tran vs Samsung Research America, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Cynthia Tran filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Samsung Research America, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7651

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

David Eun

Jacopo Lenzi

Not Yet Classified

Cynthia Kim Tran

Samsung Research America, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Ronald Scott Kravitz

Conor J Dale

 

Court Documents

Review: Mediation Status

9/9/2021 Review: Mediation Status

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/9/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/9/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Electronic

3/25/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

3/25/2021 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Request: Dismissal

5/4/2021 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/26/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

6/7/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Samsung Research America, Inc,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Samsung Research America, Inc,; Comment: to Complaint : Atty Dale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Request for Dismissal with respect to DAVID EUN, an individual and JACOPO LENZI, an individual

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Cynthia Tran,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Cynthia Tran,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAMSUNG RESEARCH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald Scott Kravitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALE, CONOR J.